Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 301 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2866 Week
» 1604 Month
» 415925 Year
» 1637490 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1030 m/e 06/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5820 on 24/02/1946
British Railways 65820 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L281
Works Number 18365
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal w/e Mon 06/05/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1908
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51L Thornaby w/e 23/06/1962
52F Blyth (North) w/e 12/01/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 52FS   5w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   on 06/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1942 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
07/1953 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
04/1957 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1030
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18365
   
04/1942 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
24/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5820    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65820    
07/1953 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
04/1957 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
06/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65820    

prev prev