|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
05/11/1966 | Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) | North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1036 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18368 |
||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5823 | ||
05/1947 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65823 | ||
06/1950 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted | ||
05/1953 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
20/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
27/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
20/03/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65823 | ||
25/03/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
07/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |