Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 96 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4056 Week
» 33642 Month
» 407655 Year
» 1629220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1036 m/e 06/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5823 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 65823 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L281
Works Number 18368
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal Mon 20/03/1967
Scrapping During 07/1967
Service Life 58 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1908
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 20/10/1956
52G Sunderland w/e 20/06/1959
50A York (North) 4w/e 27/03/1965
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 08/10/1966
   Withdrawn on 20/03/1967
52G Sunderland 4w/e 25/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 27/03/1965
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   on 20/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1947 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
06/1950 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
05/1953 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1036
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18368
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5823    
05/1947 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65823    
06/1950 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
05/1953 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
20/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65823    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev