Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 682 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14088 Week
» 67104 Month
» 186631 Year
» 3213484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1039 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5824 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65824 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1908 |
HTN |
|
Heaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
SBH |
|
Blyth (South) |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SBH |
Blyth (South) |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 05/1946 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 07/1952 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 07/1955 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1039 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18369 |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5824 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65824 |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (South) (SBH) |
|
|
07/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
07/1955 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65824 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|