Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 238 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2803 Week
» 1541 Month
» 415862 Year
» 1637427 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1056 m/e 05/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5833 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 65833 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3355
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1909
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967
Service Life 58 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1909
HAV Haverton Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51E Stockton 5w/e 15/11/1958
51L Thornaby w/e 20/06/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 07/04/1962
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 01/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1945 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1909 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1056
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3355
   
06/1945 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5833    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haverton Hill (HAV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65833    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65833    

prev prev