Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 785 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14191 Week
» 67207 Month
» 186734 Year
» 3213587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1060 |
m/e |
06/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5834 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65834 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1909 |
SUN |
|
Sunderland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/05/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 02/1942 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (North Blyth) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1060 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3356 |
|
|
02/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5834 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65834 |
|
|
24/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65834 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|