Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1066 |
m/e |
09/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5838 |
on |
17/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65838 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1909 |
PMN |
|
Percy Main |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52F |
|
Blyth (North) |
4w/e |
27/03/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/01/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 02/1942 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (North Blyth) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1066 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3360 |
|
|
02/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
17/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5838 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65838 |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
23/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65838 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|