Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1204 |
m/e |
07/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5842 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65842 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5106 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 18/01/1967 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1908 |
WHL |
|
West Hartlepool |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52E |
|
Percy Main |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/01/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52E |
Percy Main |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
27/03/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 09/1948 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 05/1955 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 11/1958 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1204 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5106 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5842 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65842 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
05/1955 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
18/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65842 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|