|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/05/1924 | 19/07/1924 | 73 days | Heavy | Heavy firebox repairs |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1927 | 07/05/1927 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1932 | 11/06/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 50 days | General | Tyres thin |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1941 | 27/09/1941 | 22 days | Light Repair | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 23 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1946 | 29/08/1946 | 27 days | Light Repair | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 23 days | Selective repairs | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1949 | 07/04/1949 | 25 days | General | Renumbered |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1951 | 03/10/1951 | 45 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1211 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5108 |
||
1924 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) | ||
08/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. Work undertaken: Heavy firebox repairs |
||
29/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927. | ||
25/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932. | ||
11/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. Work undertaken: Tyres thin |
||
10/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
08/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (South) (SBH) | ||
09/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
06/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. | ||
17/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5844 | ||
03/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 29/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
17/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Selective repairs) - Arr: 17/09/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. | ||
14/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1949. Dep: 07/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
||
04/1949 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
07/04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65844 | ||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 03/10/1951. | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65844 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |