|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/05/1924 | 16/08/1924 | 80 days | Heavy | Heavy firebox repairs |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 38 days | Light Repair | Tender drag casting cracked |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1927 | 24/09/1927 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1932 | 17/09/1932 | 43 days | General | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1936 | 29/02/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 57 days | General | Right cylinder broken |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 8 days | Non Classified | Boiler work |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 197 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 25 days | Heavy | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/02/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 12 days | Defective | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1948 | 30/04/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted Renumbered to BR 65845 |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1951 | 14/06/1951 | 25 days | General | Left leading tyre loose |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/10/1952 | 29/10/1952 | 27 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1954 | 01/10/1954 | 25 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/08/1957 | 27/09/1957 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1961 | 02/09/1961 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1962 | 12/11/1962 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1964 | 07/07/1964 | 1 day | Non Classified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1965 | 22/02/1965 | 33 days | Casual | No work – condemned instead |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1212 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5109 |
||
1924 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) | ||
29/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/05/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924. Work undertaken: Heavy firebox repairs |
||
14/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/05/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Tender drag casting cracked |
||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927. | ||
02/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
06/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
26/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
18/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 29/02/1936. | ||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Right cylinder broken |
||
23/10/1939 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) | ||
07/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. | ||
28/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 28/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler work |
||
06/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/03/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. | ||
12/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5845 | ||
11/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Defective) - Arr: 11/02/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
15/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1948. Dep: 30/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted Renumbered to BR 65845 |
||
10/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: NER 3038g number 8537 | ||
21/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 14/06/1951. Work undertaken: Left leading tyre loose |
||
03/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952. | ||
07/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954. | ||
22/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1957. Dep: 27/09/1957. | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
01/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961. | ||
02/09/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: NER 3038g number 8246 | ||
11/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1962. Dep: 12/11/1962. | ||
07/07/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 07/07/1964. Dep: 07/07/1964. | ||
21/01/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1965. Dep: 22/02/1965. Work undertaken: No work – condemned instead |
||
22/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65845 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |