Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 727 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19638 Week
» 84592 Month
» 287256 Year
» 3314109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1220 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5850 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65850 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5114 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 29/04/1963 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1908 |
SUN |
|
Sunderland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
54A |
|
Sunderland |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/04/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
52E |
Percy Main |
5w/e |
08/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/04/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 04/1942 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1220 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5114 |
|
|
04/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5850 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65850 |
|
|
29/04/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65850 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|