Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 99 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4059 Week
» 33645 Month
» 407658 Year
» 1629223 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1224 m/e 08/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5853 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 65853 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5117
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal Tue 14/02/1967
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 58 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1908
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN LIV Brunswick on 04/04/1946
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   on 14/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1946 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1224
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5117
   
03/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5853    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65853    
14/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65853    

prev prev