Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 253 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2818 Week
» 1556 Month
» 415877 Year
» 1637442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1228 m/e 08/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5856 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 65856 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5120
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal Wed 26/08/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 51 yrs , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1908
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 26/08/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 21/04/1962
50A York (North) 4w/e 27/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 26/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1945 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
07/1955 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1228
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5120
   
08/1945 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5856    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65856    
07/1955 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
26/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65856    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    

prev prev