Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 314 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2879 Week
» 1617 Month
» 415938 Year
» 1637503 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1229 m/e 08/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5857 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 65857 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5121
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal Tue 02/04/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1908
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54C Borough Gardens 5w/e 14/06/1958
52F Blyth (North) w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn on 02/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51K Saltburn w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 50G Whitby m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 02/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1956 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1229
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5121
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5857    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65857    
05/1956 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
02/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65857    

prev prev