Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3519 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16925 Week
» 69941 Month
» 189468 Year
» 3216321 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2339 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5861 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65861 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1145 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/05/1967 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
on |
30/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 08/1942 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 03/1947 |
Superheater removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2339 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1145 |
|
|
08/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5861 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65861 |
|
|
30/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
22/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65861 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|