Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2124 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19927 Week
» 72943 Month
» 192470 Year
» 3219323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2342 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5864 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65864 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1148 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/12/1963 |
Service Life |
42 yrs , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
52E |
Percy Main |
4w/e |
18/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
5w/e |
12/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
06/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 05/1946 |
Superheater removed |
by 05/1946 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/01/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Stored) |
Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. |
SLS/196402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2342 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1148 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5864 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65864 |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
23/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65864 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|