|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
05/11/1966 | Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) | North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2347 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1153 |
||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5869 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/1949 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65869 | ||
08/1956 | Modification | Modification: Superheater removed | ||
05/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
02/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) | ||
07/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
05/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth) | ||
03/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
14/02/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65869 | ||
05/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |