Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 269 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2834 Week
» 1572 Month
» 415893 Year
» 1637458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2352 m/e 06/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5874 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 65874 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/08/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1922
SEL Selby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50A York (North) 5w/e 24/03/1951
52G Sunderland w/e 11/11/1961
52B Heaton w/e 02/03/1963
52G Sunderland w/e 22/06/1963
52F Blyth (North) w/e 14/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 07/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 25/02/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 03/03/1951
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 6w/e 11/11/1961
ALLOC 52B Heaton 3w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 52FS   w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 29/01/1966
WDN   w/e 07/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1947 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
12/1949 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
02/1960 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
02/1960 Superheater removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2352
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5874    
07/1947 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL)    
12/1949 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65874    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
02/1960 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
02/1960 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
11/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
07/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65874    

prev prev