Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 262 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2827 Week
» 1565 Month
» 415886 Year
» 1637451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2357 m/e 06/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5879 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 65879 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1922
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1922
NBH Blyth (North) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 09/11/1957
52F Blyth (North) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth) 4w/e 05/11/1966
52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 15/09/1956
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 05/11/1966
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1945 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
06/1945 Superheater removed
02/1953 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
06/1956 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2357
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1945 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
06/1945 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5879    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65879    
02/1953 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
06/1956 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65879    

prev prev