Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 335 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2900 Week
» 1638 Month
» 415959 Year
» 1637524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2358 m/e 08/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5880 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 65880 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal Mon 12/06/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1922
NBH Blyth (North) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
   Withdrawn on 12/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
WDN   on 12/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1948 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/04/1964 Darlington Works (Shed Waiting Works) Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. SLS/196406
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2358
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5880    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH)    
10/1948 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65880    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
12/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65880    

prev prev