25/04/1964 |
Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. |
SLS/196406 |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |
13/08/1967 |
Sunderland MPD |
On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. |
SLS/196709 |
09/09/1967 |
Eastern Region (North) Steam Locomotive Stock |
No less than 90 steam locomotives were withdrawn in September and the total steam stock at the 1st October, 1967, was reduced to 21 as under:- 1 C1.5 4-6-0 (45208 at Low Moor). 2 Jubilees (45562 Alberta and 45593 Kolhapur at Holbeck). 1 K1 2-6-0 (62005 at Holbeck-transferred from Tyne Dock). 17 8F 2-8-0 (48055/67/70/76/84/93, 48113/69, 48222/76, 48352, 48439/73, 48537/40, 48622/64-all at Royston). The following classes are now extinct:-W.D. 2-8-0, Q6 0-8-0, B1 4-6-0, J27 0-6-0 and Stanier and Fairburn 2-cyl. 2-6-4Ts. 65882 (J27) was the last North Eastern Railway locomotive and the last of the pre-grouping companies' standard gauge locomotives to remain in service. No locomotives at all remain in the wheel classification 0-8-0, 0-6-0 and 2-6-4T. The number of tanks in British Railways stock at 1st October is 7 ! (three LMS 0-6-0Ts and one LNE J94 0-6-OST at Westhouses and three GW narrow gauge 2-6-2Ts for the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth). (Ed. Since the above was compiled, 45593 has arrived at Tyseley (Birmingham) for repainting and the three LMS 0-6-0Ts and the J94 were taken out of traffic on 4th October, when an N.C.B. diesel commenced work at Williamthorpe Colliery). |
SLS/196711 |