Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 76 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4036 Week
» 33622 Month
» 407635 Year
» 1629200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2360 m/e 08/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5882 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 65882 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1922
SEL Selby on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 4w/e 22/05/1954
52F Blyth (North) w/e 18/07/1959
52B Heaton w/e 29/09/1962
52G Sunderland w/e 22/06/1963
52F Blyth (North) w/e 14/09/1963
52G Sunderland 4w/e 20/05/1967
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 52FS   w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1944 Superheater removed
02/1944 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/04/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. SLS/196406
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709
09/09/1967 Eastern Region (North) Steam Locomotive Stock No less than 90 steam locomotives were withdrawn in September and the total steam stock at the 1st October, 1967, was reduced to 21 as under:- 1 C1.5 4-6-0 (45208 at Low Moor). 2 Jubilees (45562 Alberta and 45593 Kolhapur at Holbeck). 1 K1 2-6-0 (62005 at Holbeck-transferred from Tyne Dock). 17 8F 2-8-0 (48055/67/70/76/84/93, 48113/69, 48222/76, 48352, 48439/73, 48537/40, 48622/64-all at Royston). The following classes are now extinct:-W.D. 2-8-0, Q6 0-8-0, B1 4-6-0, J27 0-6-0 and Stanier and Fairburn 2-cyl. 2-6-4Ts. 65882 (J27) was the last North Eastern Railway locomotive and the last of the pre-grouping companies' standard gauge locomotives to remain in service. No locomotives at all remain in the wheel classification 0-8-0, 0-6-0 and 2-6-4T. The number of tanks in British Railways stock at 1st October is 7 ! (three LMS 0-6-0Ts and one LNE J94 0-6-OST at Westhouses and three GW narrow gauge 2-6-2Ts for the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth). (Ed. Since the above was compiled, 45593 has arrived at Tyseley (Birmingham) for repainting and the three LMS 0-6-0Ts and the J94 were taken out of traffic on 4th October, when an N.C.B. diesel commenced work at Williamthorpe Colliery). SLS/196711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2360
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1944 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5882    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65882    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65882    

prev prev