Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 309 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2874 Week
» 1612 Month
» 415933 Year
» 1637498 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2361 m/e 09/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5883 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 65883 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 09/1922
Withdrawal Mon 01/04/1963
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1922
NEV Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50G Whitby 4w/e 18/08/1951
50A York (North) 5w/e 22/09/1951
52G Sunderland w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn on 01/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 50G Whitby w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   on 01/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1945 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2361
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1945 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5883    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65883    
18/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65883    

prev prev