Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 121 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4081 Week
» 33667 Month
» 407680 Year
» 1629245 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2362 m/e 10/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5884 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 65884 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 10/1922
Withdrawal w/e Mon 09/12/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1922
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
51K Saltburn 4w/e 23/12/1950
51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 21/08/1954
51E Stockton 4w/e 20/08/1955
51L Thornaby w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 09/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51K Saltburn m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 09/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1946 Superheater removed
06/1955 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108
09/09/1963 Thornaby MPD (in store) The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2362
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1946 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5884    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65884    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
06/1955 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
09/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65884    

prev prev