Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3086 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16492 Week
» 69508 Month
» 189035 Year
» 3215888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2385 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5887 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65887 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1194 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 06/05/1963 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
w/e |
04/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
09/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 08/1942 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 02/1955 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 10/1958 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2385 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1194 |
|
|
08/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5887 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65887 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
04/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/1955 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
06/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65887 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|