Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 85 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4045 Week
» 33631 Month
» 407644 Year
» 1629209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2389 m/e 07/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5891 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 65891 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 07/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/12/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1923
SEL Selby on 01/01/1948
50A York (North) w/e 19/09/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 03/10/1959
52F Blyth (North) w/e 14/11/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   w/e 23/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1947 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
02/1947 Superheater removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1923 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2389
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5891    
02/1947 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
02/1947 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65891    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
23/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65891    

prev prev