Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 712 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1999 Week
» 31585 Month
» 405598 Year
» 1627163 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2392 m/e 09/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5894 m/e 03/1946
British Railways 65894 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 09/1923
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 44 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1923
NEV Neville Hill on 01/01/1948
52G Sunderland 4w/e 08/10/1966
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1948 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
09/1951 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
09/1954 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
03/1963 Superheater removed

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709
09/09/1967 Sunderland On the last day of steam working, Saturday, 9th September, 63395 worked to South Hetton and Dunston, 65894 to Vane Tempest Colliery and Dunston, 90348 to Dunston and Hylton Colliery and 90417 to South Hetton and Tyne Yard. 65894 had worked the last steam trips on the Silksworth branch on Friday, 8th September. (D2071/4 were booked for the Silksworth branch week commencing 11th September.) SLS/196710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1923 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2392
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5894    
01/1948 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
09/1951 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65894    
09/1954 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
03/1963 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65894    

prev