Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18105 Week
» 71121 Month
» 190648 Year
» 3217501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
849 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9849 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4461 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64461 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1948 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 849 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 17323 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9849 |
|
|
07/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4461 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64461 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (68E) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
02/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64461 |
|
|