Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4397 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17803 Week
» 70819 Month
» 190346 Year
» 3217199 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
851 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9851 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4463 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64463 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1906 |
HAW |
|
Hawick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64A |
|
St Margarets |
4w/e |
21/11/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
21/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1947 |
Inverurie Works |
On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. |
SLS/194710 |
13/10/1956 |
Farewell North Tyne Branch (Hawick shed) |
The last passenger trains between Newcastle and stations on the North Tyne Branch to Riccarton Junction and the last through train from Newcastle to Hawick and back, ran on Saturday, 13th October. The 11.10 a.m. train to Hawick was advertised as a public excursion and was well patronised. The train comprised six coaches of modern stock hauled by K1 2-6-0 62022, the smokebox of which was adorned with a wreath of flowers and heather surrounding a card with the letter-ing R.I.P. At Hexham, two additional coaches had to be added to accommodate passengers joining the train there and further up the branch line. Due to the length of the train, it was necessary to draw up at most of the branch line stations and on some of the grades, the K1 2-6-0 found the going heavy. At Riccarton Junction, J37 0-6-0 64539 gave banking assistance to Whitrope summit and the train arrived at Hawick nearly half an hour late. For the return journey commenced at 4.32 p.m., banking assistance was given from Hawick by D30 4-4-0 62440 ' Wandering Willie '. Many local people turned out at stations down the line to bid farewell, the largest gathering being at Bellingham where a crowd of school children cheered the train on its way. Several S.L.S. members travelled on the train and others were seen by the lineside en route taking photographs. Locomotives observed at Hawick shed included the following: 61398, 61851, 61855, 62423, 62428, 62432, 62440, 64463, 65232, 65317, 67489, 78047. |
SLS/195701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 851 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 17325 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9851 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4463 |
|
|
09/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64463 |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
16/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64463 |
|
|