Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 526 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 34238 Month
» 68880 Year
» 1290445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 195 m/e 12/1908
LNER (1924) 9195 m/e 04/1924
LNER (1946) 4482 m/e 12/1946
BR 64482 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class J35
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 12/1908
Withdrawal Tue 06/06/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 17/05/1952
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 14/06/1952
64A St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959
   Withdrawn 06/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959
WDN   06/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1947 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1908 To Service To service as NBR Number 195
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9195    
04/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4482    
09/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64482    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64482    

prev prev