Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 468 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6222 Week
» 34180 Month
» 68822 Year
» 1290387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 196 m/e 01/1909
LNER (1924) 9196 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 4483 m/e 04/1946
BR 64483 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class J35
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 01/1909
Withdrawal w/e Mon 06/06/1960
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/08/1954
64A St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 06/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959
WDN   w/e 06/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1946 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1909 To Service To service as NBR Number 196
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9196    
08/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4483    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64483    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64483    

prev prev