Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2273 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15679 Week
» 68695 Month
» 188222 Year
» 3215075 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
365 |
m/e |
11/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9365 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4495 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64495 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1909 |
THJ |
|
Thornton Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64C |
|
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 365 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18956 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9365 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4495 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64495 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
20/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64495 |
|
|