Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1848 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19651 Week
» 72667 Month
» 192194 Year
» 3219047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
367 |
m/e |
11/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9367 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4497 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64497 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1909 |
STG |
|
Stirling |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64C |
|
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
11/04/1959 |
64F |
|
Bathgate |
4w/e |
06/05/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STG |
Stirling |
on |
06/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
06/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1949 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/05/1962 |
Bathgate MPD |
Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 367 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18958 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9367 |
|
|
12/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4497 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64497 |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
09/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64497 |
|
|