Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14418 Week
» 67434 Month
» 186961 Year
» 3213814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
380 |
m/e |
04/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9380 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4510 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64510 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1910 |
BGT |
|
Bathgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64A |
|
St Margarets |
4w/e |
24/02/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1946 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1946 |
Detail Alterations |
B2 1671 has returned to Cambridge painted green, for Royal workings. 8783, one of the former Cambridge 'Royal' Clauds, has also been repainted green, and has been transferred to King's Lynn for working the Royal Train between there and Wolferton. Previously a black Lynn Claud, usually 8792, has been used on the Lynn-Wolferton part of the run. it is rumoured that a scheme is being prepared for altering the layout at King's Lynn by the completion of a triangle, which would enable Royal and other trains for the Hunstanton line to run through Lynn without reversing. 1671 is to be named 'Royal Sovereign,' a more appropriate name for its present duties than 'Manchester City.' N.B. locos recently fitted with graduated steam brake and vacuum in place of Westinghouse include 9380 an 9772. J38 1421/44 have had the steam reverse replaced by screw. |
SLS/194604 |
08/02/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 380 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19091 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9380 |
|
|
09/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4510 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64510 |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
29/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64510 |
|
|