Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3442 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16848 Week
» 69864 Month
» 189391 Year
» 3216244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
207 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9207 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4512 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64512 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STM |
St Margarets |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1951 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 207 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19093 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9207 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4512 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64512 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
16/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64512 |
|
|