Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
57 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9057 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4516 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
64516 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J35 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 10/06/1959 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 57 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9057 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4516 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64516 |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
10/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64516 |
|
|