Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2683 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16089 Week
» 69105 Month
» 188632 Year
» 3215485 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
127 |
m/e |
03/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9127 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4534 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64534 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J35 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 03/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 11/05/1961 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1913 |
BGT |
|
Bathgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/05/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/05/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. |
SLS/195010 |
18/11/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
Awaiting shopping or being shopped: 44283, 44319/24, 57251, 64564, 64812, 73106. Awaiting scrapping: 55200/2. Scrapped: 40574/9/94, 40603/48, 43883, 55236, 57349/56/73, 57554, 64534/65, 65227, 68459/71 remains. Ex-Works: 57611. |
SLS/196112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 127 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9127 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4534 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64534 |
|
|
11/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64534 |
|
|