|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1889 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 622 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
||
10/1914 | Modification | Diagram 81 boiler fitted | ||
10/1914 | Modification | Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted | ||
10/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9622 | ||
09/1939 | Reinstated | |||
11/1945 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
11/1945 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5213 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH) | ||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
10/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65213 | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
15/04/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65213 from Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
05/1957 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock |