Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 916 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18719 Week
» 71735 Month
» 191262 Year
» 3218115 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
623 |
m/e |
01/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9623 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5214 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65214 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/11/1963 off Ardrossan (67D) |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
2w/e |
04/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1916 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
12/1916 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 62247, 4509/73, 65214, 5251/61, 65305/14, 68710, ex-L.M.S. 15215/27, 56240, 17362, 57432, 17565. |
SLS/195001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 623 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1916 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9623 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5214 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65214 |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
14/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65214 from Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|