Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2929 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16335 Week
» 69351 Month
» 188878 Year
» 3215731 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
628 |
m/e |
01/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9628 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5216 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65216 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 30/04/1962 off Kipps (65E) |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1890 |
|
|
Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD |
m/e |
10/1917 |
|
|
Returned from Service with the WD/ROD |
m/e |
04/1919 |
? |
|
(Reinstated) |
m/e |
09/1939 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
8w/e |
22/12/1956 |
65E |
|
Kipps |
4w/e |
12/03/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
12/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1915 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
06/1915 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 628 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1917 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
04/1919 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
04/1919 |
Naming |
Named 'BYNG' |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9628 |
|
|
09/1939 |
Reinstated |
|
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5216 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65216 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Naming |
Renamed 'BYNG' |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
30/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65216 from Kipps (65E) |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |
|
|