Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1517 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19320 Week
» 72336 Month
» 191863 Year
» 3218716 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
654 |
m/e |
05/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9654 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5230 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65230 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Parkhead (65C) |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1891 |
BGT |
|
Bathgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
4w/e |
24/10/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
24/10/1959 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
10/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 654 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9654 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5230 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65230 |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
08/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65230 from Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |
|
|