Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2762 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16168 Week
» 69184 Month
» 188711 Year
» 3215564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
655 |
m/e |
07/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9655 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5231 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65231 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1952 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1891 |
BGT |
|
Bathgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
EFD |
Eastfield |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
BGT |
Bathgate |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1917 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
09/1917 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 61539/60, 62277, 4486, 65215/31, 5271, 5318, 67455, ex-L.M.S. 40670, 15176, 15269, 17241, 17396, 17609. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 655 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9655 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5231 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65231 |
|
|
04/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65231 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
05/1952 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|