Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 629 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14035 Week
» 67051 Month
» 186578 Year
» 3213431 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
658 |
m/e |
07/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9658 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5234 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65234 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/04/1967 off Millerhill (64A) |
Service Life |
75 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
5w/e |
12/09/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1916 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
05/1916 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/09/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 658 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1916 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9658 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5234 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65234 |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65234 from Millerhill (64A) |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|