Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
45 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9045 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5246 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65246 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 11/01/1962 off Parkhead (65C) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
17/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
26/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/01/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1917 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
03/1917 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery') |
Awaiting shopping-44328, 64553, 64572 an 90455; shopped during last four weeks-44189, 64630, 65323/7; cut-up during last five weeks-55222/6/7/33, 56305, 57233/46/57, 57429, an 40619. Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery'-40574/94/603/18/9/50/63, 44319, 54491/3, 55198, 55207/8/15/6/22/6/7/30, 56305, 57257/349/429/552/4/85, 65246 an 68459. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 45 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9045 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5246 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65246 |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65246 from Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|