Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2245 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15651 Week
» 68667 Month
» 188194 Year
» 3215047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
68 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9068 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5247 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65247 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1914 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
07/1914 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
04/1925 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
05/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
Cowlairs Works |
The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. |
SLS/194702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 68 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9068 |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5247 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65247 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
07/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
17/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65247 from Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|