Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 76 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4933 Week
» 16638 Month
» 348127 Year
» 424714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 673   12/1891
LNER (1924) 9673   08/1924
LNER (1946) 5243   11/1946
BR 65243   06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1919 MAUDE (removed 06/1945)
06/1948 MAUDE (removed 09/1956)
02/1960 MAUDE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1891
J3612/1915
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4392
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1891
Withdrawal During 07/1966 off Bathgate (64F)
Service Life 74 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD m/e 11/1917
   Returned from Service with the WD/ROD m/e 06/1919
HAY Haymarket 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 05/10/1963
64F Bathgate 4w/e 25/01/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 08/09/1963
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 3w/e 01/02/1964
WDN   14/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1915 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
12/1915 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 673
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4392
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1915 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1915 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
11/1917 Allocation      
06/1919 Allocation      
06/1919 Naming Named 'MAUDE'    
08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9673    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5243    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
06/1948 Naming Renamed 'MAUDE'    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65243    
02/1960 Naming Renamed 'MAUDE'    
02/1960 Naming Renamed 'MAUDE'    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65243 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev