Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18643 Week
» 71659 Month
» 191186 Year
» 3218039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
681 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9681 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5252 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65252 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1917 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
03/1917 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 681 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3771 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9681 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5252 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65252 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65252 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|