Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2236 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20039 Week
» 73055 Month
» 192582 Year
» 3219435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
688 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9688 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5259 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65259 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3778 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/07/1959 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1892 |
HAW |
|
Hawick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64F |
|
Bathgate |
4w/e |
26/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/07/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
26/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1916 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
12/1916 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61513/43, 62281, 4476/87, 5218/59, 65274, 5276, 65321, 68467, 69129, ex L.M.S. 4189/94, 15268, 16352, 17288, 57306. |
SLS/194911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 688 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3778 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1916 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9688 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5259 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65259 |
|
|
26/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock |
|
|
02/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65259 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|