Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1799 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15205 Week
» 68221 Month
» 187748 Year
» 3214601 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
611 |
m/e |
08/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9611 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5268 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65268 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/11/1962 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1892 |
|
|
Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD |
m/e |
11/1917 |
|
|
Returned from Service with the WD/ROD |
m/e |
06/1919 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64F |
|
Bathgate |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1914 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
07/1914 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/05/1962 |
Bathgate MPD |
Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. |
SLS/196206 |
08/02/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 611 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1917 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1919 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1919 |
Naming |
Named 'ALLENBY' |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9611 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5268 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Naming |
Renamed 'ALLENBY' |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65268 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
01/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65268 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|