Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 212 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4380 Week
» 19494 Month
» 322684 Year
» 1544249 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 182 m/e 03/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9182 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5271 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 65271 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1893
J3608/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1893
Withdrawal Tue 26/08/1952 off Dalry Road (64C)
Scrapping During 09/1952 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 59 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1893
BGT Bathgate on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 26/08/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road w/e 11/03/1950
WDN   on 26/08/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
08/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. SLS/195006
30/04/1950 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 61539/60, 62277, 4486, 65215/31, 5271, 5318, 67455, ex-L.M.S. 40670, 15176, 15269, 17241, 17396, 17609. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1893 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 182
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
08/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
08/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9182    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5271    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65271    
26/08/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 65271 from Dalry Road (64C)    

prev prev